NM SB557 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (68-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.28) Ch. 58.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (68-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.28) Ch. 58.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rural job tax credit definitions
Title
Rural job tax credit definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Passed House (68-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.28) Ch. 58. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2013-03-07 | Senate | [LD 38] Passed Senate (35-0) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-01 | Senate | [LD 34] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-03-01 | Senate | [LD 34] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |