NM SB549 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] PASSED/H (48-15) SGND (Apr. 6) Ch. 93.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] PASSED/H (48-15) SGND (Apr. 6) Ch. 93.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable energy utility & customer costs
Title
Renewable energy utility & customer costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] PASSED/H (48-15) SGND (Apr. 6) Ch. 93. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HENRC/HTRC-HENRC- DP-HTRC- DP | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] fl/a- PASSED/S (38-0) | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP/a-SCORC | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] SCONC/SCORC-SCONC |