NM SB5 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:39 N:31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extreme Risk Firearm Protection Order Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extreme Risk Firearm Protection Order Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:39 N:31
2020-02-12HouseHCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-10HouseSent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC
2020-02-07SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:22 N:20
2020-02-07Senatefl/aaaaaa
2020-02-06SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2020-01-29SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-01-22SenateSCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
2020-01-21SenateSent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SJC
2020-01-21SenateSent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback