NM SB497 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr 2) Ch.122.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr 2) Ch.122.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowner association act
Title
Homeowner association act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr 2) Ch.122. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 53] Passed House (67-0) |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-28 | House | [LD 33] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-02-28 | House | [LD 33] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Judiciary |