NM SB489 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 65 - Mar. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Energy Transition Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Transition Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 65 - Mar. 22
2019-03-12HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:43 N:22
2019-03-11HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-07HouseSent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
2019-03-06SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:32 N:9
2019-03-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment
2019-03-05SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution as amended
2019-02-26SenateSCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-07SenateSent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SCORC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback