NM SB479 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 51] Passed House (55-13) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.4) Ch.173.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 51] Passed House (55-13) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.4) Ch.173.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adequate subdivision water supplies
Title
Adequate subdivision water supplies
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Passed House (55-13) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.4) Ch.173. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Assigned to House Agriculture & Water Resources and then to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Passed Senate (35-4) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Floor amendment adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary |