NM SB474 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dps To Assist With Rape Kit Testing
Title
Dps To Assist With Rape Kit Testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 98 |
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (64-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |