NM SB47 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] PASSED/H (66-0) VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] PASSED/H (66-0) VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Tax & rev. dept. tax expenditure budget
Title
Tax & rev. dept. tax expenditure budget
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] PASSED/H (66-0) VETO. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HHGAC/HTRC-HHGAC- DP-HTRC- DP | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] PASSED/S (35-0) | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DNP-CS/DP | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] w/o rec-SFC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SCORC/SFC-SCORC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SPREF |