NM SB454 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ag & Natural Resources Trust Fund Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ag & Natural Resources Trust Fund Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateAction Postponed Indefinitely
2019-03-15HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:3
2019-03-15HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2019-03-12HouseHAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-09HouseSent to HAWC - Referrals: HAWC
2019-03-08SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:29 N:10
2019-03-06SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-26SenateSCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-01SenateSent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback