NM SB451 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (45-15) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (45-15) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Drug screening & treatment for certain women
Title
Drug screening & treatment for certain women
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-13 | [LD 55] PASSED/H (45-15) POCKET VETO. | |
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] DP | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HCPAC | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (34-0) | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DNP-CS/DP-SJC | |
2011-01-29 | [LD 12] SPAC/SJC-SPAC |