NM SB45 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Termination Of Certain Parental Rights
Title
Termination Of Certain Parental Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 121 |
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (50-14) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-19 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-19 | Senate | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |