NM SB444 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] s/cncrd POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] s/cncrd POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Thanatopractice & organ tissue procurement
Title
Thanatopractice & organ tissue procurement
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Campos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] s/cncrd POCKET VETO. | |
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] fl/aa- PASSED/H (65-0) | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP-HBIC- DP/a | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] HCPAC/HBIC-HCPAC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP/a - PASSED/S (19-18) | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP/a-SFC | |
2011-01-29 | [LD 12] SCORC/SFC-SCORC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=444&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0444.pdf |