NM SB44 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 150 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 150 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Equipment Purchases For Land Grants
Title
Equipment Purchases For Land Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 150 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:58 N:5 |
2019-03-08 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-05 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HTPWC |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-29 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |