NM SB427 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] DP - PASSED/H (43-23) SGND (Mar.29) Ch. 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] DP - PASSED/H (43-23) SGND (Mar.29) Ch. 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A-b-c-d-f schools rating system
Title
A-b-c-d-f schools rating system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] DP - PASSED/H (43-23) SGND (Mar.29) Ch. 10. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HEC/HAFC-HEC- DP-HAFC | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] fl/a- PASSED/S (23-11) | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP/a-SFC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] SEC/SFC-SEC |