NM SB411 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Telecomm Surcharges On Modern Technologies
Title
Telecomm Surcharges On Modern Technologies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 96 |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (59-0) |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |