NM SB409 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - [LD 14] Passed House (61-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - [LD 14] Passed House (61-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Historic Preservation On State Land Projects
Title
Historic Preservation On State Land Projects
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Egolf [D] | Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (61-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] HSIVC |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] HSIVC |
2017-02-12 | Senate | [LD 27] Passed Senate (29-10) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-31 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs and then to Senate Public Affairs |