NM SB367 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HAFC- DP - PASSED/H (68-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.133.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HAFC- DP - PASSED/H (68-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.133.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local govt. perm. fund, additional investment
Title
Local govt. perm. fund, additional investment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP-HAFC- DP - PASSED/H (68-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.133. | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] HTRC/HAFC-HTRC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] PASSED/S (26-4) | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP-SFC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] SPAC/SFC-SPAC |