NM SB360 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy benefits manager regulation act
Title
Pharmacy benefits manager regulation act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 53] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 53] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |