NM SB340 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Passed House (65-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.146.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Passed House (65-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.146.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
$10 million minimum design & build projects
Title
$10 million minimum design & build projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 55] Passed House (65-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.146. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |