NM SB323 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] HHGAC/HJC-HHGAC- DP/a-HJC- DP/a API.
Pending: House Health & Government Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] HHGAC/HJC-HHGAC- DP/a-HJC- DP/a API.
Pending: House Health & Government Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health care provider requirements
Title
Health care provider requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Gay Kernan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HHGAC/HJC-HHGAC- DP/a-HJC- DP/a API. | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] PASSED/S (27-6) | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] DP/a-SJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SPAC/SJC-SPAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=323&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0323.pdf |