NM SB304 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 79 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Voting District Geographic Data

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting District Geographic Data

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-20SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 79 - Apr. 6
2021-03-20SenateSenate has concurred with House Amendments
2021-03-20HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:2
2021-03-20HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2021-03-10HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-03-05HouseSent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC
2021-03-05SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:31 N:6
2021-03-04SenateSHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-02-17SenateSRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2021-02-01SenateSent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SHPAC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback