NM SB3 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - [LD 39] Passed House (65-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 31) Ch. 11.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance nominating committee changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance nominating committee changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-13House[LD 39] Passed House (65-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 31) Ch. 11.
2015-03-09House[LD 35] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-03-03House[LD 31] HBEC
2015-03-03House[LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-02-26House[LD 28] HGEIC
2015-02-26House[LD 28] HGEIC and then to HBEC
2015-02-23Senate[LD 25] Passed Senate (35-5)
2015-02-02Senate[LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2015-01-23Senate[LD 4] Referred to Senate Finance
2015-01-23Senate[LD 4] Assigned to Senate Finance
2015-01-23Senate[LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2015-01-22Senate[LD 3] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2015-01-22Senate[LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-01-20Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2015-01-20Senate[LD 1] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary
2015-01-20Senate[LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback