NM SB29 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 13 - Mar. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Solar Market Development Income Tax Credit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar Market Development Income Tax Credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 13 - Mar. 3
2020-02-19HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:51 N:19
2020-02-17HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-16HouseSent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC
2020-02-15SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:33 N:6
2020-02-15SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-01-28SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-01-22SenateSCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
2020-01-21SenateSent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SCORC/SFC
2020-01-21SenateSent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback