NM SB289 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] s and then to rpt adptd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.4) Ch.161.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] s and then to rpt adptd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.4) Ch.161.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
5-year senior property tax freeze
Title
5-year senior property tax freeze
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] s and then to rpt adptd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.4) Ch.161. |
2013-03-16 | Senate | [LD 52] h and then to rpt adptd |
2013-03-16 | Senate | [LD 52] Conference committee |
2013-03-16 | Senate | [LD 52] h and then to fld recede |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] s and then to fld cncr |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (63-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | [LD 31] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-02-26 | House | [LD 31] Assigned to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs and then to House Taxation & Revenue |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Passed Senate (35-0) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-01-31 | Senate | [LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | [LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-17 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-17 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |