NM SB277 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (41-21) VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (41-21) VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase magistrate courts operations fee
Title
Increase magistrate courts operations fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (41-21) VETO. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] HTRC | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] PASSED/S (31-4) | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] DP-SFC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SJC/SFC-SJC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=277&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0277.pdf |