NM SB275 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Passed House (61-1) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.129.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Passed House (61-1) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.129.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board of body art practitioners
Title
Board of body art practitioners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Passed House (61-1) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.129. |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] HHC |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] HHC and then to House Judiciary and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-02-19 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (39-1) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | [LD 23] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |