NM SB266 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 74 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 74 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Stagger Certain Judicial Terms
Title
Stagger Certain Judicial Terms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 74 - Apr. 6 |
2021-03-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:5 |
2021-03-16 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-08 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-25 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HJC |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC |