NM SB248 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (58-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (58-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled veteran benefit assessments
Title
Disabled veteran benefit assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (58-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.115. |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] HWMC |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |