NM SB245 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Passed House (48-17) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Passed House (48-17) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confidential Substitute Address Act
Title
Confidential Substitute Address Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (48-17) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] HSIVC |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] HSIVC and then to House Judiciary |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |