NM SB244 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowner Association Dispute Resolution
Title
Homeowner Association Dispute Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (62-0) |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] HSIVC |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] HSIVC |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Passed Senate (30-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | [LD 23] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-08 | Senate | [LD 23] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |