NM SB242 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] HLC- DP/a API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] HLC- DP/a API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirees as precinct board members
Title
Public retirees as precinct board members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HLC- DP/a API. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] PASSED/S (33-0) | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] w/drn | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SFC | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] DP-SJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SRC/SJC/SFC-SRC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=242&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0242.pdf |