NM SB234 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 162 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 162 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pollinator Protection License Plate
Title
Pollinator Protection License Plate
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 162 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-16 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:56 N:2 |
2019-03-11 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | House | Sent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:30 N:3 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-08 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |