NM SB232 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (51-3) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (51-3) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Buprenorphine treatment for opioid addiction
Title
Buprenorphine treatment for opioid addiction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (51-3) POCKET VETO. | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] PASSED/S (31-3) | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] DP/a | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] DP-SFC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SPAC/SFC-SPAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=232&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0232.pdf |