NM SB229 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Healthy Food Financing Act
Title
Healthy Food Financing Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-13 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:2 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-24 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SFC |