NM SB226 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-04 - [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-04 - [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicle Tax To Road Fund
Title
Motor Vehicle Tax To Road Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-04 | Senate | [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 3 |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (70-0) |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |