NM SB21 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local Firefighter Recruitment
Title
Local Firefighter Recruitment
Sponsors
Rep. Cynthia Borrego [D] | Sen. Siah Correa Hemphill [D] | Sen. Leo Jaramillo [D] | Rep. Tara Lujan [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Stefanics [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2024-02-13 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-07 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HAFC |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-18 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SHPAC/SFC |