NM SB21 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 23 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 23 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retiree Health Care Act
Title
Retiree Health Care Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 23 - Apr. 5 |
2021-03-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:1 |
2021-03-10 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-03 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-25 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HSEIC |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:31 N:9 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SFC |