NM SB21 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 68 - Mar. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 68 - Mar. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Professional Loan Repayment Changes
Title
Health Professional Loan Repayment Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 68 - Mar. 27 |
2019-03-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2019-03-08 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-28 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-06 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HSEIC |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:32 N:0 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |