NM SB208 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Passed House (50-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Passed House (50-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fraud against taxpayers definitions
Title
Fraud against taxpayers definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Passed House (50-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.128. |
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] HGEIC |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] HGEIC and then to House Judiciary |
2015-02-19 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (42-0) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |