NM SB206 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Passed House (60-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 10) Ch. 62.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Passed House (60-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 10) Ch. 62.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Foster care system student tuition waiver
Title
Foster care system student tuition waiver
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (60-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 10) Ch. 62. |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Education |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (42-0) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Education |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Judiciary |