NM SB2 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Passed House (65-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Passed House (65-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Changes
Title
Medicaid Changes
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Papen [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (65-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 9] HHouse Health |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 9] HHouse Health |
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (34-0) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 18] fl and then to sub adptd |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | Senate | [LD 7] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |