NM SB2 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Passed House (51-16) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Additional Agency Info To State Auditor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Additional Agency Info To State Auditor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-29House[LD 13] Passed House (51-16) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
2017-01-29House[LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-22House[LD 6] HSIVC
2017-01-22House[LD 6] HSIVC and then to House Taxation & Revenue
2017-01-28Senate[LD 12] Passed Senate (40-0)
2017-01-27Senate[LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2017-01-19Senate[LD 3] Referred to Senate Finance
2017-01-19Senate[LD 3] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2017-01-17Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2017-01-17Senate[LD 1] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance
2017-01-17Senate[LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback