NM SB2 | 2016 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-01 - [LD 2] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Transfer & Distribute Tobacco Settlement Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfer & Distribute Tobacco Settlement Fund

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2016-10-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-09-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-10-01Senate[LD 2] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 4
2016-10-01Senate[LD 2] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill
2016-10-05House[LD 7] Passed House (43-22)
2016-10-05House[LD 7] Floor amendment adopted
2016-10-01House[LD 2] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2016-09-30House[LD 1] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance
2016-10-01Senate[LD 2] Passed Senate (41-1)
2016-09-30Senate[LD 1] Do pass committee report adopted
2016-09-30Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback