NM SB196 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-17 - [LD 24] Passed House (68-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.7) Ch.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-17 - [LD 24] Passed House (68-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.7) Ch.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools for deaf & blind capital outlay
Title
Schools for deaf & blind capital outlay
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Passed House (68-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.7) Ch.53. | |
2012-02-16 | [LD 23] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Referred to House Education | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Passed Senate (30-0) | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Education | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |