NM SB193 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (67-0) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (67-0) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State agency 5-year facility master plans
Title
State agency 5-year facility master plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (67-0) POCKET VETO. | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP-HAFC | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] HHGAC/HAFC-HHGAC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] w/drn - PASSED/S (35-0) | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] DP-SFC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SPAC/SFC-SPAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=193&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0193.pdf |