NM SB182 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Behavioral Health Community Integration Act
Title
Behavioral Health Community Integration Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-14 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-11 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2020-02-08 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-29 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SFC |