NM SB17 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 18 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 18 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Family Income Index Act
Title
Family Income Index Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 18 - Apr. 5 |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:52 N:18 |
2021-03-17 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-14 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC |
2021-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:6 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-03-01 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC |