NM SB168 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 52 - Mar. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Foster Youth Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster Youth Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 52 - Mar. 6
2020-02-20HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:69 N:0
2020-02-19HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-18HouseSent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
2020-02-17SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0
2020-02-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment
2020-02-16SenateWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2020-02-15SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2020-01-29SenateSCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
2020-01-27SenateSent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SJC/SFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback