NM SB16 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid Overdose Medication Counseling
Title
Opioid Overdose Medication Counseling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] HHouse Health |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] HHouse Health and then to House Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Passed Senate (24-16) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |