NM SB154 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.209.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.209.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hours of sunday alcohol sales
Title
Hours of sunday alcohol sales
Sponsors
Sen. John Ryan [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.209. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Passed House (45-22) |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | [LD 25] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2013-02-18 | House | [LD 25] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (34-6) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |